|
10/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3040.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 1317.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1176.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 783.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 363.) (March 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Set for hearing March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|