California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB44 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2017

Amended

Bill May 26, 2017
Bill March 20, 2017