|
10/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 670, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2836.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 3161.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1135.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 824.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 751.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
(Corrected March 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|