California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB442 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2017

Amended

Bill September 7, 2017
Bill March 20, 2017