|
07/24/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1933.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2472.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 803.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Published April 18 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|