California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB447 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill July 11, 2017

Chaptered

Bill July 24, 2017

Amended

Bill June 29, 2017
Bill April 18, 2017