|
07/31/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2583.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1143.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Published May 9 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 945.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|