|
09/10/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 329, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5687.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 6478.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
August 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 6.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1327.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1185.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|