California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB473 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2018

Amended

Bill August 16, 2018
Bill September 5, 2017
Bill August 21, 2017
Bill July 3, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill March 22, 2017