|
09/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 240, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2232.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2634.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 801.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|