California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB489 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2017

Amended

Bill July 5, 2017
Bill March 21, 2017