|
03/03/2018
|
Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2017
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2842.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 3218.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1328.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1185.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 848.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
April 19 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|