California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB494 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Amended

Bill July 17, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill May 3, 2017