|
10/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 628, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2927.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3271.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1329.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1185.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 784.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 627.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
March 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|