California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB498 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2017

Amended

Bill September 5, 2017
Bill July 6, 2017
Bill June 22, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill April 6, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017