|
09/29/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 929, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6058.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 6763.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
August 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
May 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|