California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB501 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill August 20, 2018
Bill May 1, 2017
Bill April 20, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017