|
09/17/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 444, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 6168.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 6200.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6112.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 6470.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4068.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4019.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2017
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
April 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19 in EQ. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
April 5 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|