California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB519 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2018

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill January 3, 2018