|
10/07/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 569, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2928.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3272.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1357.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1187.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 747.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 488.) (March 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|