California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB559 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2017

Amended

Bill September 7, 2017
Bill September 5, 2017
Bill July 18, 2017
Bill April 24, 2017
Bill April 6, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017