|
10/02/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2785.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3032.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 797.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Published April 18 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|