California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB564 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2017

Amended

Bill August 31, 2017
Bill July 17, 2017
Bill June 8, 2017
Bill April 18, 2017