|
10/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 672, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2928.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3525.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 767.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|