California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB582 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill August 31, 2017