|
03/03/2018
|
Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2480.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2846.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 830.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|