California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Amended

Bill August 24, 2017
Bill June 27, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017