|
05/31/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5082.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 5167.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3254.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on APPR. and RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
(Corrected October 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 17. Page 2690.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2017
|
July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1072.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 944.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|