California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB606 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2018

Chaptered

Bill May 31, 2018

Amended

Bill May 7, 2018
Bill April 5, 2018
Bill September 6, 2017
Bill August 29, 2017
Bill August 21, 2017
Bill July 13, 2017
Bill June 22, 2017
Bill April 6, 2017