|
07/17/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/17/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1838.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2404.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 802.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 748.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|