California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB610 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2017

Chaptered

Bill July 17, 2017

Amended

Bill June 19, 2017
Bill June 5, 2017