|
09/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6172.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4114.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4056.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2018
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3098.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2017
|
Set for hearing January 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|