California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB635 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill June 27, 2018
Bill June 12, 2018
Bill January 23, 2018
Bill January 3, 2018
Bill April 3, 2017