|
10/02/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 433, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2566.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1252.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Published May 16 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Published May 3 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Senator Jackson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|