California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB690 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2017

Amended

Bill July 20, 2017
Bill May 16, 2017
Bill May 3, 2017
Bill March 27, 2017