|
09/29/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 928, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 5563.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6107.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 4069.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4043.) (January 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3098.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2017
|
Set for hearing January 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
April 17 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|