California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB70 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2018

Amended

Bill June 13, 2018
Bill January 17, 2018
Bill January 3, 2018
Bill March 30, 2017