|
03/03/2018
|
Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2017
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2906.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3169.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1333.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1189.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 511.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|