|
09/30/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 6168.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 6200.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5112.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 6549.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Assembly Rule 78 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 955.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 914.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|