California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB715 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2018

Amended

Bill August 27, 2018
Bill August 24, 2018
Bill April 25, 2017