|
09/17/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 447, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5463.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6309.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4069.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2018
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3098.) (January 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2017
|
Set for hearing January 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
April 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|