California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB795 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2018

Amended

Bill July 3, 2018
Bill June 20, 2018
Bill January 10, 2018