Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1020.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Set for hearing May 10. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | May 3 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and ED. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |