Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
Held in committee without recommendation.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
June 27 set for first hearing.Testimony taken.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2018
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4397.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4298.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4810.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4723.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|