LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB831
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB831
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB831
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 4, 2018
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 21, 2018
Compare
Bill
May 25, 2018
Compare
Bill
May 14, 2018
Compare
Bill
May 1, 2018
Compare
Bill
April 9, 2018
Compare
Bill
March 13, 2018
Compare