|
09/29/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 6026.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 6771.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4344.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4298.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4366.) (March 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2018
|
Set for hearing March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|