California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB836 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill August 20, 2018
Bill May 15, 2018
Bill March 20, 2018
Bill March 5, 2018