|
09/22/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 685, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6061.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6714.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4451.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4298.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
April 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4722.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4366.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2018
|
Set for hearing March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|