California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB881 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2018

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill June 19, 2018
Bill April 3, 2018