|
08/24/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 199, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5223.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6148.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4763.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4622.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2018
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4366.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Set for hearing March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|